Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021