House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|