Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 17, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022