Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 94, NAYS 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 224215 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 221655 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (167810)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|