Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0468 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 11, 2022
Bill December 3, 2021