Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 273
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 273
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|