Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0486 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022