House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/19/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|