LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0498
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0498
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0498
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 14, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
January 28, 2022
Analysis
January 26, 2022
Analysis
January 19, 2022
Analysis
January 18, 2022
Analysis
January 13, 2022
Analysis
January 10, 2022
Comm Sub
Bill
January 13, 2022
Compare