Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 255
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 255
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Education; Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|