Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021