|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-28
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (108283)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 108283 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 731
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (703254)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/19/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|