Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis December 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2022