Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 837
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 837
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|