Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022