Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 1523
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Substituted HB 1523
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|