Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0590 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis December 1, 2021