|
06/09/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/19/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|