Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 11, 2022