|
06/09/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (981283)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment 981283 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 493
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (472652)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|