Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2022