Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 69, NAYS 45
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 521123 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 773345 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 199089 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (507868, 609228)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/20/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Original reference(s)- removed: Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Rules; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|