Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill January 27, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2022