Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/27/2021 | Filed |