Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022