Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Transportation; Judiciary; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/28/2021 | Filed |