Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022