Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 268503 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 149149 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 471609 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 815983 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 538171 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|