LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0714
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0714
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0714
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 1, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
March 8, 2022
Analysis
February 25, 2022
Analysis
February 23, 2022
Analysis
February 22, 2022
Analysis
February 21, 2022
Analysis
January 26, 2022
Analysis
January 24, 2022
Comm Sub
Bill
January 26, 2022
Compare