Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 469
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 469
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/19/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|