Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0718 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022