Senate | 03/08/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 459 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Substituted HB 459 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/22 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/02/2021 | Filed |