Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022