|
05/19/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-123
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 223
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|