Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0754 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill December 2, 2021