Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 968849 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 1441
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|