Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0756 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 12, 2022