Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 631
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted HB 631
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/26/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|