Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0780 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021