Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/02/2021 | Filed |