Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0788 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022