Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1239
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1239
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|