Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0804 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022