Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 475
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/26/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|