|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for HM 505
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/04/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|