Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022