Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/04/2021 | Filed |