Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0832 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022