Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/02/2021 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 12/02/2021 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/05/2021 | Filed |