Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis December 1, 2021